NV AJR2A | 2019 | 80th Legislature
Note: Carry Over of previous AJR2
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-28 - File No. 22.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-28 - File No. 22.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Proposing to amend the Nevada Constitution to require the recognition of all marriages regardless of gender.
Title
Proposes to amend the Nevada Constitution to require the recognition of all marriages regardless of gender. (BDR C-690)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-23 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 19 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-28 | Assembly | File No. 22. |
2019-05-28 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Secretary of State. |
2019-05-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. To enrollment. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 19, Nays: 2.) To Assembly. |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Read second time. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To committee. |
2019-04-01 | Senate | In Senate. |
2019-03-29 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 38, Nays: 2, Excused: 2.) To Senate. |
2019-03-27 | Assembly | Read second time. |
2019-03-25 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2019-02-04 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2019-02-04 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To printer. |
2019-02-04 | Assembly | Returned from Secretary of State. |
Same As/Similar To
AJR2 (Carry Over) 2017-05-05 - File No. 17.