NV AJR7 | 2019 | 80th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-28 - File No. 26.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-28 - File No. 26.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Expressing the opposition
Title
Expresses the opposition of the Nevada Legislature to the proposed expansion of the Fallon Range Training Complex. (BDR R-1099)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-23 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 13 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-28 | Assembly | File No. 26. |
2019-05-28 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Secretary of State. |
2019-05-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. To enrollment. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. Preamble adopted. (Yeas: 13, Nays: 8.) To Assembly. |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Read second time. |
2019-05-08 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Natural Resources. To committee. |
2019-04-17 | Senate | In Senate. |
2019-04-16 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. Preamble adopted. (Yeas: 39, Nays: 1, Excused: 2.) To Senate. |
2019-04-15 | Assembly | Read second time. |
2019-04-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2019-03-26 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2019-03-25 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Mining. To printer. |