NV SB109 | 2019 | 80th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-04 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-04 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to education; requiring public schools to install cameras in certain classrooms within a school which are used for special education; prescribing the length of time such a recording may be retained; specifying the circumstances under which such a recording may be released; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Requires cameras to be installed in certain classrooms within a public school which are used for special education. (BDR 34-10)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-04 | Senate | (No further action taken.) |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Exemption effective. |
2019-04-18 | Senate | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. To committee. |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Re-referred to Committee on Finance. To printer. |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 288.) |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2019-04-17 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Read first time. To committee. |
2019-01-29 | Senate | From printer. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer. |