NV SB11 | 2019 | 80th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-13 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-13 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to local governments; exempting certain cities from certain regulations of the State Fire Marshal relating to building codes; extending the deadline to adopt certain building and fire code standards as required to maintain an exemption from certain regulations of the State Fire Marshal; and other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises the requirements to qualify for and maintain an exemption from certain regulations concerning building codes. (BDR 42-460)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-13 | Senate | (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.) |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Read first time. To committee. |
2018-11-19 | Senate | From printer. |
2018-11-14 | Senate | Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer. |
Nevada State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.leg.state.nv.us/App/NELIS/REL/80th2019/Bill/5867/Overview |
Text | https://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/80th2019/Bills/SB/SB11.pdf |