NV SB113 | 2019 | 80th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-30 - Chapter 227.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-30 - Chapter 227.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to homeland security; revising the membership of the Nevada Commission on Homeland Security; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions relating to the membership of the Nevada Commission on Homeland Security. (BDR 19-577)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-30 | Senate | Chapter 227. |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Approved by the Governor. |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2019-05-27 | Senate | In Senate. To enrollment. |
2019-05-24 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 39, Nays: None, Excused: 2, Vacant: 1.) To Senate. |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | Read second time. |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2019-03-11 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee. |
2019-03-11 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 19, Nays: None, Excused: 1, Vacant: 1.) To Assembly. |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Read second time. |
2019-03-04 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Read first time. To committee. |
2019-01-29 | Senate | From printer. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer. |