NV SB137 | 2019 | 80th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 76.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to crimes; revising the definition of the crime of robbery; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises the definition of the crime of robbery. (BDR 15-928)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-16SenateApproved by the Governor. Chapter 76.
2019-05-14SenateEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2019-05-13SenateIn Senate. To enrollment.
2019-05-10AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 40, Nays: None, Excused: 1, Vacant: 1.) To Senate.
2019-05-09AssemblyRead second time.
2019-05-08AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass.
2019-03-25AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.
2019-03-25AssemblyIn Assembly.
2019-03-21SenateRead third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Assembly.
2019-03-21SenateTaken from Secretary's desk. Placed on General File.
2019-03-20SenateTaken from General File. Placed on Secretary's desk.
2019-03-19SenateTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2019-03-18SenateRead second time.
2019-03-15SenateFrom committee: Do pass.
2019-02-12SenateFrom printer. To committee.
2019-02-11SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback