NV SB141 | 2019 | 80th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-13 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-13 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to the Nevada Equal Rights Commission; requiring the Commission to perform specific activities relating to disseminating information regarding the Commission and its role with respect to sexual harassment and the laws relating to sexual harassment and provide a report relating to these activities; requiring the change of a certain position within the Commission to a different occupational group; making an appropriation; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions relating to the Nevada Equal Rights Commission. (BDR S-249)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-13 | Senate | (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.) |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2019-02-12 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer. |
Nevada State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.leg.state.nv.us/App/NELIS/REL/80th2019/Bill/6172/Overview |
Text | https://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/80th2019/Bills/SB/SB141.pdf |