NV SB143 | 2019 | 80th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-0)
Status: Passed on February 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-15 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 2.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-0)
Status: Passed on February 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-15 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 2.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to firearms; repealing, revising and reenacting provisions relating to background checks for certain sales or transfers of firearms; prohibiting a fee from being charged for certain background checks; requiring a licensed dealer of firearms to conduct a background check before a private party sale or transfer in certain circumstances; providing a penalty; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Repeals, revises and reenacts provisions relating to background checks for certain sales or transfers of firearms. (BDR 15-755)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-15 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 28 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 13 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 13 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-15 | Senate | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 2. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | In Senate. To enrollment. |
2019-02-15 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 28, Nays: 13, Excused: 1.) To Senate. |
2019-02-14 | Assembly | Read second time. |
2019-02-14 | Assembly | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2019-02-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2019-02-13 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee. |
2019-02-13 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2019-02-13 | Senate | To Assembly. |
2019-02-13 | Senate | (Yeas: 13, Nays: 8.) |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Passed. Title approved. |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Read third time. |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Read second time. |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2019-02-12 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2019-02-12 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer. |