NV SB175 | 2019 | 80th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Passed on June 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-01 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 276.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Passed on June 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-01 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 276.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to public works; defining discrete project; revising provisions relating to the authority of a public body to enter into a contract with a design-build team for the construction of certain public works; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions relating to public works. (BDR 28-618)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-01 | Senate | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 276. |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Assembly Amendment Nos. 761 and 895 concurred in. To enrollment. |
2019-05-27 | Senate | In Senate. |
2019-05-24 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 39, Nays: None, Excused: 2, Vacant: 1.) To Senate. |
2019-05-24 | Assembly | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint. |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 895.) To printer. |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 761.) To printer. |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2019-03-07 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee. |
2019-03-07 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Vacant: 1.) To Assembly. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Read second time. |
2019-03-04 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2019-02-19 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer. |