NV SB180 | 2019 | 80th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-04 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-04 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to purchasing; requiring a state agency who awards a large contract for the procurement of an information system, information service or information technology to either withhold a certain percentage of any amount due under the contract as retainage or require the contractor to furnish a performance bond; requiring such a state agency to submit certain reports concerning the contract; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions relating to the awarding of certain state purchasing contracts related to information technology. (BDR 27-739)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-04 | Senate | (No further action taken.) |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Exemption effective. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. To committee. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Re-referred to Committee on Finance. To printer. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 443.) |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2019-02-19 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer. |