NV SB201 | 2019 | 80th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-28 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 177.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-28 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 177.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to financial services; adopting certain provisions of the federal Military Lending Act; requiring the Commissioner of Financial Institutions to develop, implement and maintain a database storing certain information relating to deferred deposit loans, title loans and high-interest loans made to customers in this State; providing that information in such a database is confidential under certain circumstances; authorizing a person who operates a deposit loan service, title loan service or high-interest loan service to distribute certain information and materials concerning public assistance and services; authorizing the Department of Business and Industry and the Bureau of Consumer Protection in the Office of the Attorney General to inform the public regarding certain information; revising provisions that prohibit the making of a deposit loan or high-interest loan that exceeds or requires payments that exceed a certain percentage of the customer's expected gross monthly income; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions governing loans. (BDR 52-568)
Sponsors
Sen. Yvanna Cancela [D] | Sen. Julia Ratti [D] | Sen. David Parks [D] | Rep. Jason Frierson [D] |
Rep. Steve Yeager [D] | Sen. Chris Brooks [D] | Sen. James Ohrenschall [D] | Sen. Patricia Spearman [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 28 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 13 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 13 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-28 | Senate | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 177. |
2019-05-25 | Senate | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | In Senate. To enrollment. |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 28, Nays: 12, Excused: 1, Vacant: 1.) To Senate. |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | Read second time. |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2019-04-19 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee. |
2019-04-19 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2019-04-19 | Senate | From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint. To Assembly. |
2019-04-18 | Senate | To printer. |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 13, Nays: 8.) |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Reprinting dispensed with. |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 551.) |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2019-04-17 | Senate | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 156.) To printer. |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2019-04-16 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2019-02-19 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer. |