NV SB203 | 2019 | 80th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on June 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-13 - Chapter 601.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on June 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-13 - Chapter 601.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to persons with disabilities; authorizing the establishment of a program to negotiate discounts and rebates for hearing devices and related costs for children who are deaf or hard of hearing; requiring the establishment of a program to provide hearing aids at no charge to certain children who reside in low-income households; providing for the establishment of criteria for evaluating the development of language and literacy skills by certain young children who are deaf, hard of hearing, blind, visually impaired or both deaf and blind; requiring the Department of Education to develop a resource for parents or guardians to measure the development of such skills by such children; requiring a team developing certain plans and programs for such children to use the established criteria to measure the development of such skills by such children; requiring the Department to publish an annual report concerning the development of such skills by such children; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions governing programs for children who are blind, visually impaired, deaf or hard of hearing. (BDR 38-77)
Sponsors
Sen. Patricia Spearman [D] | Sen. Joyce Woodhouse [D] | Sen. David Parks [D] | Sen. Joseph Hardy [R] |
Sen. James Ohrenschall [D] | Sen. Lisa Krasner [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-13 | Senate | Chapter 601. |
2019-06-12 | Senate | Approved by the Governor. |
2019-06-07 | Senate | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2019-06-05 | Senate | To enrollment. |
2019-06-03 | Senate | From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Third reprint. |
2019-06-03 | Senate | To printer. |
2019-06-03 | Senate | (Conference Amend. No. CA3.) |
2019-06-03 | Senate | Conference report adopted by Assembly. |
2019-06-02 | Senate | Conference report adopted by Senate. |
2019-06-02 | Senate | From committee: Concur in Assembly Amendment No. 811 and further amend. |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Conference Committee appointed by Senate. To committee. |
2019-05-31 | Senate | In Senate. |
2019-05-31 | Assembly | Assembly Amendment No. 811 not receded from. Conference requested. Conference Committee appointed by Assembly. To Senate. |
2019-05-28 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Assembly Amendment No. 811 not concurred in. To Assembly. |
2019-05-24 | Senate | In Senate. |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 40, Nays: None, Excused: 1, Vacant: 1.) To Senate. |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint. |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 811.) To printer. |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2019-04-25 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee. |
2019-04-25 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 164.) To printer. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2019-02-19 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer. |