NV SB218 | 2019 | 80th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Chapter 479.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Chapter 479.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to domestic violence; revising provisions relating to temporary and extended orders for protection against domestic violence; revising provisions relating to the crime of battery which constitutes domestic violence; providing penalties; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions relating to domestic violence. (BDR 3-316)
Sponsors
Sen. Nicole Cannizzaro [D] | Sen. Patricia Spearman [D] | Sen. Kelvin Atkinson [D] | Sen. Chris Brooks [D] |
Sen. Moises Denis [D] | Sen. David Parks [D] | Sen. Joyce Woodhouse [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-10 | Senate | Chapter 479. |
2019-06-07 | Senate | Approved by the Governor. |
2019-06-02 | Senate | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Assembly Amendment No. 819 concurred in. To enrollment. |
2019-05-24 | Senate | In Senate. |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 40, Nays: None, Excused: 1, Vacant: 1.) To Senate. |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 819.) To printer. |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2019-04-11 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee. |
2019-04-11 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Read second time. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2019-02-19 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer. |