NV SB23 | 2019 | 80th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-04 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-04 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to public safety; revising provisions governing the testing of a driver for the presence and quantity of controlled substances; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions relating to testing of a driver for the presence of alcohol or controlled substances. (BDR 43-345)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-04 | Senate | (No further action taken.) |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Exemption effective. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. To committee. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Re-referred to Committee on Finance. To printer. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 51.) |
2019-04-05 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2019-02-24 | Senate | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Read first time. To committee. |
2018-11-19 | Senate | From printer. |
2018-11-15 | Senate | Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Growth and Infrastructure. To printer. |