NV SB262 | 2019 | 80th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-30 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 258.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-30 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 258.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to prescription drugs; making various changes to provide for tracking and reporting of information concerning the pricing of prescription drugs for treating asthma; requiring certain insurers to provide certain notice concerning those drugs to insureds; providing for an administrative penalty for failure to provide certain information concerning those drugs to the Department of Health and Human Services; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Makes various changes to provide for tracking and reporting of information concerning the pricing of prescription drugs for treating asthma. (BDR 40-55)
Sponsors
Sen. Yvanna Cancela [D] | Sen. Julia Ratti [D] | Sen. Nicole Cannizzaro [D] | Sen. David Parks [D] |
Sen. Chris Brooks [D] | Sen. James Ohrenschall [D] | Sen. Patricia Spearman [D] | Sen. Joyce Woodhouse [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 28 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 19 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 19 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-30 | Senate | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 258. |
2019-05-25 | Senate | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | In Senate. To enrollment. |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 28, Nays: 12, Excused: 1, Vacant: 1.) To Senate. |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | Read second time. |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2019-04-19 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee. |
2019-04-19 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 19, Nays: 2.) To Assembly. |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Read third time. |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Taken from Secretary's desk. Placed on General File. |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on Secretary's desk. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Read second time. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2019-03-13 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer. |