NV SB274 | 2019 | 80th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-14 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 46.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to crimes; revising the penalties for certain acts related to discharging a firearm; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises provisions relating to crimes. (BDR 15-1076)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-07 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-14SenateApproved by the Governor. Chapter 46.
2019-05-09SenateEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2019-05-08SenateIn Senate. To enrollment.
2019-05-07AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 39, Nays: None, Excused: 2, Vacant: 1.) To Senate.
2019-05-06AssemblyTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2019-05-03AssemblyRead second time.
2019-05-01AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass.
2019-03-29AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.
2019-03-29AssemblyIn Assembly.
2019-03-27SenateRead third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Assembly.
2019-03-26SenateRead second time.
2019-03-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass.
2019-03-14SenateFrom printer. To committee.
2019-03-13SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback