NV SB286 | 2019 | 80th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2)
Status: Passed on May 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-14 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 47.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to offenders; revising provisions relating to the aggregation of sentences; establishing provisions relating to the determination of the minimum aggregate term of imprisonment in certain circumstances for purposes of determining eligibility for parole; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises provisions relating to aggregated sentences and eligibility for parole. (BDR 14-293)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-07 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-14SenateApproved by the Governor. Chapter 47.
2019-05-09SenateEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2019-05-08SenateIn Senate. To enrollment.
2019-05-07AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 39, Nays: None, Excused: 2, Vacant: 1.) To Senate.
2019-05-06AssemblyTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2019-05-03AssemblyRead second time.
2019-05-01AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass.
2019-04-11AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.
2019-04-11AssemblyIn Assembly.
2019-04-09SenateRead third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
2019-04-08SenateRead second time.
2019-04-05SenateFrom committee: Do pass.
2019-03-18SenateFrom printer. To committee.
2019-03-15SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback