NV SB29 | 2019 | 80th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-30 - Chapter 224.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-30 - Chapter 224.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to unarmed combat; authorizing the Nevada Athletic Commission to adopt, revise or repeal rules governing the conduct of contests and exhibitions of unarmed combat through certain procedures; revising provisions governing the deposit of money received by the Executive Director of the Commission and the Commission; revising provisions relating to the issuance, renewal, suspension and revocation of licenses and permits issued by the Commission; revising provisions relating to the license fee imposed for holding a live contest or exhibition of unarmed combat; making certain technical corrections; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Makes various changes relating to unarmed combat. (BDR 41-363)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-30 | Senate | Chapter 224. |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Approved by the Governor. |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2019-05-27 | Senate | In Senate. To enrollment. |
2019-05-24 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 38, Nays: 1, Excused: 2, Vacant: 1.) To Senate. |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | Read second time. |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee. |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Assembly. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Read third time. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Placed on General File. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Exemption effective. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Taken from General File. Re-referred to Committee on Finance. To committee. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Read second time. |
2019-03-04 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2019-02-24 | Senate | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Read first time. To committee. |
2018-11-20 | Senate | From printer. |
2018-11-16 | Senate | Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer. |