NV SB3 | 2019 | 80th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Chapter 500.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Chapter 500.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to criminal procedure; requiring an offender to exhaust all available administrative remedies before filing a postconviction petition for a writ of habeas corpus challenging the computation of time the offender has served; revising provisions governing the county in which an offender must file a postconviction petition for a writ of habeas corpus challenging the computation of time the offender has served; requiring the Department of Corrections to adopt regulations concerning expedited resolution of certain challenges to the computation of time an offender has served; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions governing postconviction petitions for a writ of habeas corpus that challenge the computation of time served in incarceration by an offender. (BDR 3-411)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-31 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-31 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-10 | Senate | Chapter 500. |
2019-06-07 | Senate | Approved by the Governor. |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2019-06-03 | Senate | In Senate. To enrollment. |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Vacant: 1.) To Senate. |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2019-06-01 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee. |
2019-06-01 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Assembly. |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Placed on General File. |
2019-05-31 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Exemption effective. |
2019-04-16 | Senate | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. To committee. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Re-referred to Committee on Finance. To printer. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 79.) |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2019-02-24 | Senate | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Read first time. To committee. |
2018-11-15 | Senate | From printer. |
2018-11-14 | Senate | Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer. |