NV SB30 | 2019 | 80th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-20 - Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 40, Nays: None, Excused: 1, Vacant: 1.) To Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to offenders; revising certain requirements for private employers who enter into contracts for the employment of offenders; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises provisions governing the duties of the Director of the Department of Corrections to provide programs for the employment of offenders. (BDR 16-202)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-20AssemblyRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 40, Nays: None, Excused: 1, Vacant: 1.) To Senate.
2019-05-16AssemblyTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2019-05-16AssemblyFrom printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint.
2019-05-15AssemblyRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 698.) To printer.
2019-05-14AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2019-04-17AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.
2019-04-17AssemblyIn Assembly.
2019-04-16SenateRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
2019-04-16SenateFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
2019-04-15SenateRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 10.) To printer.
2019-04-10SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2019-02-04SenateRead first time. To committee.
2018-11-20SenateFrom printer.
2018-11-16SenatePrefiled. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback