NV SB300 | 2019 | 80th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-30 - Chapter 215.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-30 - Chapter 215.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to electric utilities; authorizing an electric utility to file an application for the establishment of an alternative rate-making plan; requiring the Public Utilities Commission of Nevada to adopt regulations governing the filing of such an application; revising the dates for the filing of general rate applications by electric utilities; repealing certain duties of the Commission relating to determining the impact of net metering on rates charged by electric utilities; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions governing the rates charged by electric utilities. (BDR 58-302)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-30 | Senate | Chapter 215. |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Approved by the Governor. |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Assembly Amendment No. 722 concurred in. To enrollment. |
2019-05-24 | Senate | In Senate. |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 40, Nays: None, Excused: 1, Vacant: 1.) To Senate. |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint. |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 722.) To printer. |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2019-04-25 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Growth and Infrastructure. To committee. |
2019-04-25 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 324.) To printer. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Growth and Infrastructure. To printer. |