NV SB302 | 2019 | 80th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-05 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 412.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-05 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 412.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to privacy; requiring a governmental agency to comply, to the extent practicable, with certain standards with respect to the collection, dissemination and maintenance of records containing personal information of a resident of this State; prohibiting the Legislative Auditor from including certain information in the report of an audit; requiring the Legislative Auditor to report certain information concerning the security of the information system of an agency of the State under certain circumstances; authorizing a governmental agency to require a person to submit a record containing personal information by electronic means; requiring certain state agencies to remove data from certain electronic waste; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions relating to personal information collected by governmental agencies. (BDR 52-547)
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2019-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-05 | Senate | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 412. |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Assembly Amendment Nos. 764 and 922 concurred in. To enrollment. |
2019-05-27 | Senate | In Senate. |
2019-05-27 | Assembly | To Senate. |
2019-05-27 | Assembly | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Third reprint. |
2019-05-24 | Assembly | To printer. |
2019-05-24 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 39, Nays: None, Excused: 2, Vacant: 1.) |
2019-05-24 | Assembly | Dispensed with reprinting. |
2019-05-24 | Assembly | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 922.) |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint. |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 764.) To printer. |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2019-04-23 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee. |
2019-04-23 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2019-04-19 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. Nos. 483 and 484.) To printer. |
2019-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2019-04-19 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2019-04-14 | Senate | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer. |