NV SB319 | 2019 | 80th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Chapter 514.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Chapter 514.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to education; defining school counselor, school psychologist and school social worker for certain purposes; establishing the duties of a school counselor, psychologist and social worker; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions relating to education. (BDR 34-1063)
Sponsors
Sen. Joyce Woodhouse [D] | Sen. Moises Denis [D] | Sen. David Parks [D] | Sen. Chris Brooks [D] |
Sen. Yvanna Cancela [D] | Sen. Nicole Cannizzaro [D] | Sen. James Ohrenschall [D] | Sen. Julia Ratti [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-10 | Senate | Chapter 514. |
2019-06-07 | Senate | Approved by the Governor. |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2019-06-03 | Senate | Assembly Amendment No. 1088 concurred in. To enrollment. |
2019-06-03 | Senate | In Senate. |
2019-06-02 | Assembly | To Senate. |
2019-06-02 | Assembly | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint. |
2019-06-02 | Assembly | To printer. |
2019-06-02 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Vacant: 1.) |
2019-06-02 | Assembly | Dispensed with reprinting. |
2019-06-02 | Assembly | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1088.) |
2019-06-02 | Assembly | Placed on General File. |
2019-06-02 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. Exemption effective. To committee. |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | Taken from General File. |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | Read second time. |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2019-04-25 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To committee. |
2019-04-25 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 283.) To printer. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2019-04-14 | Senate | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer. |