NV SB322 | 2019 | 80th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-04 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-04 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to peace officers; providing for an increase in compensation for state law enforcement officers for a specified period to the extent of available money; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions relating to peace officers. (BDR S-918)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-04 | Senate | (No further action taken.) |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Exemption effective. |
2019-04-18 | Senate | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. To committee. |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Re-referred to Committee on Finance. To printer. |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 513.) |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2019-04-17 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and re-refer to Committee on Finance. |
2019-04-14 | Senate | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer. |