NV SB328 | 2015 | 78th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 18 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-02 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 18 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-02 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Revises provisions relating to policies of health insurance. (BDR 57-794)
Title
Revises provisions relating to policies of health insurance. (BDR 57-794)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 17 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-02 | Assembly | (No further action taken.) |
2015-05-18 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee. |
2015-05-18 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2015-05-15 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 17, Nays: 4.) To Assembly. |
2015-05-14 | Senate | From committee: Without recommendation, as amended. |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Exemption effective. |
2015-04-21 | Senate | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . To committee. |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Re-referred to Committee on Finance. To printer. |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 463.) |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2015-04-20 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2015-03-18 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Energy. To printer. |