NV SB347 | 2019 | 80th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-05 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 414.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to hemp; revising provisions relating to the growth, handling and production of hemp; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises provisions relating to hemp. (BDR 49-976)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-05SenateApproved by the Governor. Chapter 414.
2019-05-30SenateEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2019-05-28SenateAssembly Amendment No. 751 concurred in. To enrollment.
2019-05-27SenateIn Senate.
2019-05-24AssemblyRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 39, Nays: None, Excused: 2, Vacant: 1.) To Senate.
2019-05-23AssemblyTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2019-05-23AssemblyFrom printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint.
2019-05-22AssemblyRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 751.) To printer.
2019-05-21AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2019-04-23AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Mining. To committee.
2019-04-23AssemblyIn Assembly.
2019-04-22SenateRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Not voting: 1.) To Assembly.
2019-04-22SenateFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
2019-04-19SenateRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 146.) To printer.
2019-04-19SenatePlaced on Second Reading File.
2019-04-19SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2019-03-20SenateFrom printer. To committee.
2019-03-18SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Natural Resources. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback