NV SB350 | 2019 | 80th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-30 - Chapter 218.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-30 - Chapter 218.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to higher education; revising provisions governing the awarding of Nevada Promise Scholarships; creating the Nevada Promise Scholarship Program to be administered by the Board of Regents of the University of Nevada; authorizing the Board of Regents to waive certain requirements for eligibility for certain students who are granted a leave of absence from the Program; revising the eligibility criteria for a student to receive a Nevada Promise Scholarship; revising provisions governing the disbursement of money from the Nevada Promise Scholarship Account; eliminating provisions requiring a community college to maintain certain records relating to Nevada Promise Scholarships; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions relating to Nevada Promise Scholarships. (BDR 34-308)
Sponsors
Sen. Moises Denis [D] | Sen. Joyce Woodhouse [D] | Rep. Tyrone Thompson [D] | Sen. Edgar Flores [D] |
Rep. Richard Carrillo [D] | Sen. Dina Neal [D] | Rep. Teresa Benitez-Thompson [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-30 | Senate | Chapter 218. |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Approved by the Governor. |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Assembly Amendment No. 785 concurred in. To enrollment. |
2019-05-24 | Senate | In Senate. |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 40, Nays: None, Excused: 1, Vacant: 1.) To Senate. |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 785.) To printer. |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2019-04-11 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To committee. |
2019-04-11 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Read second time. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2019-03-20 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer. |