NV SB351 | 2019 | 80th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Introduced on March 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-04 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-04 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to education; requiring the Department of Education to initiate certain evaluations of the Nevada Educational Choice Scholarship Program; requiring scholarship organizations that provide grants under the Nevada Educational Choice Scholarship Program to meet certain requirements; revising provisions relating to pupils with certain disabilities; requiring the Department to conduct an independent evaluation of certain scholarship programs for pupils; revising provisions relating to the authorization of certain tax credits; creating a tax credit from the insurance premium tax for donations made to a scholarship organization; making an appropriation; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Makes certain changes relating to education. (BDR 34-247)
Sponsors
Sen. James Settelmeyer [R] | Sen. Pete Goicoechea [R] | Sen. Ira Hansen [R] | Sen. Keith Pickard [R] |
Rep. Jill Tolles [R] | Sen. Scott Hammond [R] | Sen. Joseph Hardy [R] | Sen. Ben Kieckhefer [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-04 | Senate | (No further action taken.) |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Exemption effective. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Re-referred to Committee on Finance. To committee. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | From committee: Re-refer to Committee on Finance. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2019-03-20 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer. |
Nevada State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.leg.state.nv.us/App/NELIS/REL/80th2019/Bill/6634/Overview |
Text | https://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/80th2019/Bills/SB/SB351.pdf |