NV SB368 | 2019 | 80th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-05 - Chapter 313.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-05 - Chapter 313.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to victims of crime; establishing a rebuttable presumption in civil actions concerning unwelcome or nonconsensual sexual conduct by a person in a position of authority over an alleged victim; authorizing a child adjudicated delinquent for certain unlawful acts who was a victim of sex trafficking or involuntary servitude to petition the juvenile court to vacate the adjudication and seal all records relating thereto; establishing the Sexual Assault Survivors' Bill of Rights; increasing the time within which an extended order of protection against a person who allegedly committed a sexual assault may remain effective; revising provisions relating to such extended orders of protection; revising provisions relating to the crime of prostitution or solicitation of prostitution; revising provisions relating to investigations by an administrator of a public school into a report of bullying or cyber-bullying; revising provisions relating to facilities that offer services to persons with an intellectual disability or developmental disability; revising provisions relating to the testing of a person alleged to have committed a sexual offense; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions relating to protections for victims of crime. (BDR 3-166)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-05 | Senate | Chapter 313. |
2019-06-03 | Senate | Approved by the Governor. |
2019-06-01 | Senate | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Assembly Amendment No. 822 concurred in. To enrollment. |
2019-05-24 | Senate | In Senate. |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 40, Nays: None, Excused: 1, Vacant: 1.) To Senate. |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint. |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 822.) To printer. |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2019-04-25 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee. |
2019-04-25 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 446.) To printer. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2019-04-14 | Senate | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2019-03-21 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer. |