NV SB381 | 2019 | 80th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-13 - Chapter 550.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to industrial insurance; establishing the substantive right of an injured employee to choose a treating physician or chiropractor under the Nevada Industrial Insurance Act or the Nevada Occupational Diseases Act; revising provisions governing the panel of treating physicians and chiropractors established by the Administrator of the Division of Industrial Relations of the Department of Business and Industry to require the inclusion of certain physicians and chiropractors; authorizing the Administrator to select a rating physician or chiropractor for an injured employee upon request; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises provisions relating to workers' compensation. (BDR 53-1157)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-01 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-13SenateChapter 550.
2019-06-12SenateApproved by the Governor.
2019-06-07SenateEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2019-06-03SenateIn Senate. To enrollment.
2019-06-03AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Vacant: 1.) To Senate.
2019-06-03AssemblyDeclared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
2019-06-03AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass.
2019-06-02AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee.
2019-06-02AssemblyIn Assembly.
2019-06-01SenateFrom printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint. To Assembly.
2019-06-01SenateTo printer.
2019-06-01SenateRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.)
2019-06-01SenateReprinting dispensed with.
2019-06-01SenateRead third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1055.)
2019-06-01SenatePlaced on General File.
2019-06-01SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2019-04-23SenateExemption effective.
2019-04-23SenateFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. To committee.
2019-04-22SenateRe-referred to Committee on Finance. To printer.
2019-04-22SenateRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 487.)
2019-04-22SenatePlaced on Second Reading File.
2019-04-22SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2019-04-14SenateNotice of eligibility for exemption.
2019-03-21SenateFrom printer. To committee.
2019-03-20SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback