NV SB383 | 2019 | 80th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 39, Nays: None, Excused: 2, Vacant: 1.) To Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to sexual conduct; establishing a rebuttable presumption in civil actions concerning unwelcome or nonconsensual sexual conduct between a law enforcement officer and a person in his or her custody; prohibiting sexual conduct between a law enforcement officer and a person who is under arrest or is currently detained by any law enforcement officer; providing a penalty; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes provisions relating to sexual conduct between a law enforcement officer and certain other persons. (BDR 3-113)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-16AssemblyRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 39, Nays: None, Excused: 2, Vacant: 1.) To Senate.
2019-05-16AssemblyFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
2019-05-15AssemblyRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 672.) To printer.
2019-05-14AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2019-04-11AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.
2019-04-11AssemblyIn Assembly.
2019-04-09SenateRead third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
2019-04-08SenateRead second time.
2019-04-05SenateFrom committee: Do pass.
2019-03-21SenateFrom printer. To committee.
2019-03-20SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback