NV SB384 | 2019 | 80th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 20 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-13 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 20 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-13 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to criminal procedure; removing the period within which a prosecution for perjury or subornation of perjury must be commenced in certain circumstances; revising provisions governing the conduct of discovery in criminal actions; establishing provisions relating to the filing of a petition for a hearing to establish the factual innocence of a person based on newly discovered evidence; creating the Public Integrity Unit Commission; establishing provisions relating to the duties and authority of the Commission; making an appropriation; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions relating to criminal procedure. (BDR 14-857)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-13 | Senate | (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.) |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2019-03-21 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer. |
Nevada State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.leg.state.nv.us/App/NELIS/REL/80th2019/Bill/6696/Overview |
Text | https://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/80th2019/Bills/SB/SB384.pdf |