NV SB388 | 2019 | 80th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-13 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 613.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to public records; providing for the designation of certain public records and portions of public records as confidential; requiring a governmental entity to grant a request to copy such records under certain circumstances; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises provisions relating to public records. (BDR 19-827)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 29 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-01 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-13SenateApproved by the Governor. Chapter 613.
2019-06-07SenateEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2019-06-03SenateIn Senate. To enrollment.
2019-06-03AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 29, Nays: 12, Vacant: 1.) To Senate.
2019-06-03AssemblyDeclared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
2019-06-03AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass.
2019-06-02AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee.
2019-06-02AssemblyIn Assembly.
2019-06-01SenateRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 15, Nays: 6.) To Assembly.
2019-06-01SenatePlaced on General File.
2019-06-01SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended.
2019-04-22SenateExemption effective.
2019-04-22SenateFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. To committee.
2019-04-19SenateRe-referred to Committee on Finance. To printer.
2019-04-19SenateRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 437.)
2019-04-19SenatePlaced on Second Reading File.
2019-04-19SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2019-04-09SenateNotice of eligibility for exemption.
2019-03-21SenateFrom printer. To committee.
2019-03-20SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback