NV SB398 | 2017 | 79th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-05 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 391.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-05 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 391.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes various provisions relating to the use of blockchain technology. (BDR 59-158)
Title
Establishes various provisions relating to the use of blockchain technology. (BDR 59-158)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-04 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-05 | Senate | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 391. |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Assembly Amendment No. 681 concurred in. To enrollment. |
2017-05-29 | Senate | In Senate. |
2017-05-26 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Senate. |
2017-05-26 | Assembly | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint . |
2017-05-25 | Assembly | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 681.) To printer. |
2017-05-25 | Assembly | Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. |
2017-05-25 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2017-04-26 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee. |
2017-04-26 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. |
2017-04-25 | Senate | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 217.) To printer. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2017-03-22 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer. |