NV SB398 | 2019 | 80th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-25 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.4, no further action allowed.)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-25 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.4, no further action allowed.)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to local government; requiring a board of county commissioners and the governing body of an incorporated city to use certain money for the development or redevelopment of affordable housing; providing that the powers of a board of county commissioners to address matters of local concern include certain powers relating to affordable housing; providing that the powers of the governing body of an incorporated city to address matters of local concern include certain powers relating to affordable housing; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions relating to affordable housing. (BDR 20-1074)
Sponsors
Sen. Julia Ratti [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-18 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-25 | Assembly | (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.4, no further action allowed.) |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | Placed on Chief Clerk's desk. |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | Taken from General File. |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | Read second time. |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2019-04-19 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee. |
2019-04-19 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 15, Nays: 6.) To Assembly. |
2019-04-18 | Senate | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 244.) To printer. |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2019-04-17 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2019-03-21 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer. |