NV SB400 | 2019 | 80th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-30 - Chapter 239.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-30 - Chapter 239.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to public livestock auctions; revising the amount of certain surety bonds required to be submitted to the Director of the State Department of Agriculture by an applicant for a license to operate a public livestock auction; revising certain requirements for an application to renew a license to operate a public livestock auction; requiring each holder of a license to operate a public livestock auction to submit to the Director an annual audit of the licensee's custodial consignment account; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions governing the auditing and bonding of public livestock auctions. (BDR 50-634)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-19 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-19 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-30 | Senate | Chapter 239. |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Approved by the Governor. |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2019-05-27 | Senate | In Senate. To enrollment. |
2019-05-24 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 39, Nays: None, Excused: 2, Vacant: 1.) To Senate. |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | Read second time. |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Mining. To committee. |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2019-04-19 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. |
2019-04-19 | Senate | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 177.) To printer. |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2019-04-18 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2019-03-21 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Natural Resources. To printer. |