NV SB426 | 2019 | 80th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 81.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 81.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to transportation; extending the deadline for a regional transportation commission to submit certain recommendations relating to the imposition of certain taxes to the board of county commissioners; extending the deadline for a board of county commissioners to submit a ballot question to the voters regarding the imposition of certain taxes; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions related to transportation. (BDR 22-686)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-16 | Senate | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 81. |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2019-05-13 | Senate | In Senate. To enrollment. |
2019-05-10 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 40, Nays: None, Excused: 1, Vacant: 1.) To Senate. |
2019-05-09 | Assembly | Read second time. |
2019-05-08 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2019-04-29 | Assembly | Rereferred to Committee on Growth and Infrastructure. To committee. |
2019-04-29 | Assembly | Withdrawn from committee. |
2019-04-17 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Taxation. To committee. |
2019-04-17 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Read second time. |
2019-04-10 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Re-referred to Committee on Growth and Infrastructure. To committee. |
2019-03-28 | Senate | From committee: Re-refer to Committee on Growth and Infrastructure. |
2019-03-25 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer. |