NV SB43 | 2011 | 76th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 13 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-13 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 313.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 13 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-13 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 313.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Makes various changes relating to electronic health records. (BDR 40-443)
Title
Makes various changes relating to electronic health records. (BDR 40-443)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-13 | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 313. | |
2011-06-06 | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. | |
2011-06-05 | In Senate. To enrollment. | |
2011-05-30 | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 38, Nays: 4.) To Senate. | |
2011-05-30 | Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. | |
2011-05-30 | From committee: Do pass. | |
2011-05-17 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee. | |
2011-05-17 | In Assembly. | |
2011-05-16 | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Not voting: 1.) To Assembly. | |
2011-05-14 | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. | |
2011-05-13 | From committee: Do pass, as amended. | |
2011-04-27 | Exemption effective. | |
2011-04-27 | To committee. | |
2011-04-27 | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . | |
2011-04-26 | Rereferred to Committee on Finance. To printer. | |
2011-04-26 | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 219.) | |
2011-04-25 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. | |
2011-03-04 | Notice of eligibility for exemption. | |
2011-02-07 | Read first time. To committee. | |
2010-12-16 | From printer. | |
2010-12-14 | Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer. |