NV SB433 | 2019 | 80th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 82.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 82.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to the California-Nevada Compact for Jurisdiction on Interstate Waters; revising and extending the provisions of the Compact; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises the provisions of the California-Nevada Compact for Jurisdiction on Interstate Waters. (BDR 14-439)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-16 | Senate | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 82. |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2019-05-13 | Senate | In Senate. To enrollment. |
2019-05-10 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 40, Nays: None, Excused: 1, Vacant: 1.) To Senate. |
2019-05-09 | Assembly | Read second time. |
2019-05-08 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2019-04-23 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee. |
2019-04-23 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint. |
2019-04-19 | Senate | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 556.) To printer. |
2019-04-19 | Senate | Taken from Secretary's desk. Placed on General File. |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on Secretary's desk. |
2019-04-18 | Senate | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 322.) To printer. |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2019-04-17 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2019-03-26 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer. |