NV SB45 | 2019 | 80th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 72.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to business; revising the circumstances under which a person is not required to obtain a state business license; revising provisions governing the location at which certain documents of certain limited-liability partnerships, limited partnerships, foreign business trusts, and professional entities and associations are required to be maintained; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises provisions governing business. (BDR 7-471)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-16SenateApproved by the Governor. Chapter 72.
2019-05-14SenateEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2019-05-13SenateIn Senate. To enrollment.
2019-05-10AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 40, Nays: None, Excused: 1, Vacant: 1.) To Senate.
2019-05-09AssemblyRead second time.
2019-05-08AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass.
2019-04-17AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.
2019-04-17AssemblyIn Assembly.
2019-04-16SenateRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
2019-04-16SenateFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
2019-04-15SenateRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 81.) To printer.
2019-04-15SenatePlaced on Second Reading File.
2019-04-15SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2019-02-04SenateRead first time. To committee.
2018-11-21SenateFrom printer.
2018-11-19SenatePrefiled. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback