NV SB46 | 2019 | 80th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-10 - In Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to gaming; revising the definition of gross revenue; prohibiting a person from performing an act that requires registration without being registered; revising the definition of service provider; providing for the registration, rather than licensure, of service providers; authorizing the Attorney General or district attorney of any county to apply for a court order to intercept communications during an investigation involving certain offenses relating to gaming; providing a penalty; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises provisions relating to the regulation of gaming. (BDR 41-342)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-09 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-10SenateIn Senate.
2019-05-09AssemblyRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 40, Nays: None, Excused: 1, Vacant: 1.) To Senate.
2019-05-09AssemblyFrom printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint.
2019-05-08AssemblyRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 653.) To printer.
2019-05-07AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2019-04-23AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.
2019-04-23AssemblyIn Assembly.
2019-04-22SenateRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
2019-04-22SenateFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
2019-04-19SenateRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 12.) To printer.
2019-04-19SenatePlaced on Second Reading File.
2019-04-19SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2019-02-04SenateRead first time. To committee.
2018-11-21SenateFrom printer.
2018-11-19SenatePrefiled. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback