NV SB467 | 2019 | 80th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-13 - Chapter 554.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to education; extending the duration of the Zoom schools program; extending the duration of the Victory schools program; revising provisions relating to the Office of the Superintendent of Public Instruction; making an appropriation; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises provisions relating to education. (BDR S-820)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-13SenateChapter 554.
2019-06-12SenateApproved by the Governor.
2019-06-07SenateEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2019-06-03SenateIn Senate. To enrollment.
2019-06-03AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 40, Nays: None, Excused: 1, Vacant: 1.) To Senate.
2019-06-03AssemblyDeclared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
2019-06-03AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass.
2019-06-03AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee.
2019-06-03AssemblyIn Assembly.
2019-06-03SenateFrom printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Third reprint. To Assembly.
2019-06-03SenateTo printer.
2019-06-03SenateRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.)
2019-06-03SenateReprinting dispensed with.
2019-06-03SenateRead third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1099.)
2019-06-02SenateTaken from Secretary's desk. Placed on General File.
2019-06-01SenateFrom printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint. To Secretary's desk.
2019-06-01SenateTo printer.
2019-06-01SenatePlaced on Secretary's desk.
2019-06-01SenateRead third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1078.)
2019-06-01SenatePlaced on General File.
2019-06-01SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2019-04-23SenateExemption effective.
2019-04-23SenateFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. To committee.
2019-04-22SenateRe-referred to Committee on Finance. To printer.
2019-04-22SenateRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 515.)
2019-04-22SenatePlaced on Second Reading File.
2019-04-22SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2019-04-15SenateNotice of eligibility for exemption.
2019-03-26SenateFrom printer. To committee.
2019-03-25SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback