NV SB491 | 2019 | 80th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-30 - Chapter 253.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-30 - Chapter 253.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to vehicles; revising provisions relating to obtaining a salvage title or a nonrepairable vehicle certificate for a vehicle that is the object of certain insurance settlements or donations; revising provisions relating to the issuance of a salvage title or a nonrepairable vehicle certificate by the Department of Motor Vehicles; revising provisions relating to a lien on certain vehicles; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions concerning vehicles. (BDR 43-135)
Sponsors
Sen. Moises Denis [D] | Sen. Chris Brooks [D] | Sen. Nicole Cannizzaro [D] | Sen. Julia Ratti [D] |
Sen. Patricia Spearman [D] | Sen. Joyce Woodhouse [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-30 | Senate | Chapter 253. |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Approved by the Governor. |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2019-05-27 | Senate | In Senate. To enrollment. |
2019-05-24 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 38, Nays: 1, Excused: 2, Vacant: 1.) To Senate. |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | Read second time. |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2019-04-25 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Growth and Infrastructure. To committee. |
2019-04-25 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 331.) To printer. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2019-03-28 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Growth and Infrastructure. To printer. |