NV SB74 | 2019 | 80th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-14 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 43.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to unlawful detainer; revising provisions governing eviction actions; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises provisions governing eviction actions. (BDR 3-492)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-07 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-14SenateApproved by the Governor. Chapter 43.
2019-05-09SenateEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2019-05-08SenateIn Senate. To enrollment.
2019-05-07AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 39, Nays: None, Excused: 2, Vacant: 1.) To Senate.
2019-05-06AssemblyTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2019-05-03AssemblyRead second time.
2019-05-01AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass.
2019-04-17AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.
2019-04-17AssemblyIn Assembly.
2019-04-16SenateRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
2019-04-16SenateFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
2019-04-15SenateRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 14.) To printer.
2019-04-10SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2019-02-04SenateRead first time. To committee.
2018-11-26SenateFrom printer.
2018-11-20SenatePrefiled. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback