NV SB8 | 2019 | 80th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-05 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 386.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-05 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 386.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to sex offenders; revising provisions governing sex offenders who are under a program of lifetime supervision; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions governing the conditions for lifetime supervision of sex offenders. (BDR 16-408)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-05 | Senate | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 386. |
2019-06-02 | Senate | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Assembly Amendment Nos. 817 and 901 concurred in. To enrollment. |
2019-05-27 | Senate | In Senate. |
2019-05-24 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 39, Nays: None, Excused: 2, Vacant: 1.) To Senate. |
2019-05-24 | Assembly | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Third reprint. |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 901.) To printer. |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint. |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 817.) To printer. |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2019-04-25 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee. |
2019-04-25 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 188.) To printer. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Read first time. To committee. |
2018-11-15 | Senate | From printer. |
2018-11-14 | Senate | Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer. |