NV SJR17A | 2017 | 79th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-09 - File No. 47.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-09 - File No. 47.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Proposes to amend the Nevada Constitution to expand the rights guaranteed to victims of crime. (BDR C-952)
Title
Proposes to amend the Nevada Constitution to expand the rights guaranteed to victims of crime. (BDR C-952)
Sponsors
Sen. Michael Roberson [R] | Sen. Becky Harris [R] | Sen. Patricia Farley [I] | Sen. Joseph Hardy [R] |
Sen. James Settelmeyer [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-09 | Senate | File No. 47. |
2017-06-09 | Senate | Enrolled and delivered to Secretary of State. |
2017-06-06 | Senate | To enrollment. |
2017-06-06 | Senate | From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint . |
2017-06-05 | Senate | To printer. |
2017-06-05 | Senate | Conference report adopted by Assembly. |
2017-06-05 | Senate | Conference report adopted by Senate. |
2017-06-05 | Senate | From committee: Recede from Assembly Amendment No. 894. |
2017-06-04 | Senate | Conference Committee appointed by Senate. To committee. |
2017-06-04 | Senate | In Senate. |
2017-06-03 | Assembly | Assembly Amendment No. 894 not receded from. Conference requested. Conference Committee appointed by Assembly. To Senate. |
2017-05-31 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Assembly Amendment No. 894 not concurred in. To Assembly. |
2017-05-29 | Senate | In Senate. |
2017-05-29 | Assembly | To Senate. |
2017-05-29 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . |
2017-05-26 | Assembly | To printer. |
2017-05-26 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) |
2017-05-26 | Assembly | Dispensed with reprinting. |
2017-05-26 | Assembly | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 894.) |
2017-05-26 | Assembly | Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. |
2017-05-26 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2017-04-18 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To committee. |
2017-04-18 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Read second time. |
2017-04-04 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2017-02-06 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer. |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Returned from Secretary of State. |