NY A00047 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 37-6)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the sale and distribution of flavored e-liquid which creates a distinguishable flavor or aroma for use in e-cigarettes.
Title
Prohibits the sale and distribution of flavored e-liquid which creates a distinguishable flavor or aroma for use in e-cigarettes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-28 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 16 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2019-04-26 | Assembly | print number 47a |
2019-04-26 | Assembly | amend and recommit to codes |
2019-02-28 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2019-01-09 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S00428 (Same As) 2020-01-14 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES