NY A00057 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on December 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-20 - approval memo.62
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on December 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-20 - approval memo.62
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires domestic violence and sexual assault awareness education for persons engaged in the practice of nail specialty, waxing, natural hair styling, esthetics and cosmetology and establishes such education programs.
Title
Requires domestic violence and sexual assault awareness education for persons engaged in the practice of nail specialty, waxing, natural hair styling, esthetics and cosmetology and establishes such education programs.
Sponsors
Asm. Linda Rosenthal [D] | Asm. Amy Paulin [D] | Asm. Felix Ortiz [D] | Asm. Walter Mosley [D] |
Asm. Michael Blake [D] | Asm. Richard Gottfried [D] | Asm. Taylor Darling [D] | Asm. Jo Simon [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 51 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 123 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Economic Development Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 123 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Economic Development Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-20 | Senate | approval memo.62 |
2019-12-20 | Senate | signed chap.715 |
2019-12-17 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-06-17 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-17 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-17 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1444 |
2019-06-17 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6307 |
2019-06-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.465 |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | reported |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2019-01-09 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
Same As/Similar To
S06307 (Same As) 2019-12-20 - approval memo.62