NY A00072 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-16 - advanced to third reading cal.327
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-16 - advanced to third reading cal.327
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the superintendent to promulgate regulations which provide standardized definitions for commonly used terms and phrases in certain insurance policies.
Title
Requires the superintendent to promulgate regulations which provide standardized definitions for commonly used terms and phrases in certain insurance policies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-14 - Assembly - Assembly Insurance Committee: Favorable (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-16 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.327 |
2020-01-14 | Assembly | reported |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
2019-01-09 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
Same As/Similar To
S03501 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO INSURANCE