NY A00086 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - advanced to third reading cal.364
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibits cancellation, non-renewal or conditioning renewal of automobile insurance of a policyholder solely as a result of a dispute or a complaint pending against the insurer.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibits cancellation, non-renewal or conditioning renewal of automobile insurance of a policyholder solely as a result of a dispute or a complaint pending against the insurer.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Assembly - Assembly Insurance Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 15 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-23Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.364
2019-05-21Assemblyreported
2019-05-06Assemblyreported referred to codes
2019-01-09Assemblyreferred to insurance

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback